U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kruger
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 23, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 08, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.