U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dotson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 01, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 01, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 10, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 28, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 24, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 23, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 08, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.