U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00036
  • Case Name: White v. Torgerson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 20, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • December 20, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 21, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 25, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • October 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to Amend ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Settlement Conference - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
  • August 01, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • August 01, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • August 01, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 26, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 08, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.