U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clark
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 14, 2022: [Dismiss ]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • July 26, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 01, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 03, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summons]
  • May 13, 2022: [Summons]
  • May 04, 2022: [Docket Call]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 08, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.