U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rattler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 01, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 11, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • June 08, 2022: [Revoke]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • May 25, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order]
  • May 10, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 05, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Revoke]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • April 18, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 12, 2022: [Forfeiture Hearing]
  • April 12, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.