U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00031
  • Case Name: State of Montana v. Gulley
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 14, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Quash]
  • October 07, 2022: [Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 02, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 02, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.