U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00033
  • Case Name: Gladstone v. City of Billings et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Interim]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • July 25, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • June 14, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • June 14, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 10, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 13, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 13, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.