U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00027
  • Case Name: Bentle v. Farmers Insurance Exchange et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Appeal - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 13, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • December 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • November 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 19, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 07, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • November 04, 2022: [Hearing]
  • November 04, 2022: [In Limine]
  • November 04, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • June 08, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Protective Order]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction]
  • April 19, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.