U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00075
  • Case Name: Brown v. Florence-Carlton Schoold District 15-6 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 28, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • July 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 21, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • July 21, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • July 21, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • May 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 15, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 13, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.