U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00076
  • Case Name: Kinsale Insurance Company v. Clearview Horizon, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 12, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Service - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Declaratory Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Declaratory Judgment - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 13, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 13, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.