U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-cv-00009
  • Case Name: Raugust v. Abbey
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [USCA Mandate - SDM]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 16, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 09, 2022: [Vacate]
  • November 09, 2022: [Stay]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 04, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Hearing]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 29, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 15, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 14, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 07, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • September 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 01, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 01, 2022: [In Limine]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 25, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • August 17, 2022: [In Limine]
  • August 17, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • July 25, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • July 21, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Telephonic Status Conference]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 27, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 22, 2022: [Settlement Conference - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 27, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • May 20, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • May 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 17, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 13, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 13, 2022: [Strike - SDM]
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - SDM]
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 02, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 02, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • April 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 18, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 18, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 13, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.