U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00077
  • Case Name: Elton et al v. Raymond
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [Status Report]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 11, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 18, 2022: [Stay]
  • April 18, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 18, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • April 15, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.