U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00078
  • Case Name: Reihansperger v. Bretz, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 07, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 30, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 20, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • May 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • May 19, 2022: [Mediation - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • April 21, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 21, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 15, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.