U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-00026
  • Case Name: Apodaca v. Salmonsen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 03, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 15, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • April 15, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.