U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00037
  • Case Name: Loftsgaard et al v. City of Glasgow et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • November 11, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • November 10, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 23, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 02, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 20, 2022: [Remark]
  • April 20, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 15, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.