U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00079
  • Case Name: Rahmatpour v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 03, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 22, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • August 15, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • August 15, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • August 11, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • July 27, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • June 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • April 19, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • April 19, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.