U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hedges
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Entry of Appearance - MT]
  • October 10, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 20, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 19, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.