U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Adams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 05, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 05, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • September 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 02, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • April 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 27, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 19, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.