U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00034
  • Case Name: Taggart v. Salmonsen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 05, 2022: [Stay]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • August 29, 2022: [Stay]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
  • May 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.