U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-00027
  • Case Name: Glenn et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • January 25, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings - SDM]
  • January 09, 2023: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • December 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 09, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • December 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • November 18, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • November 18, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • November 18, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 18, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Extension of Time re Transcript]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • May 12, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 20, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 20, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.