U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00035
  • Case Name: Zolnikov v. National Board of Medical Examiners
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 12, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 27, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 20, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 20, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.