U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00039
  • Case Name: Burns v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • August 26, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief - MT]
  • August 26, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Social Security Briefing Schedule - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Administrative Record]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • April 25, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 20, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • April 20, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.