U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lambson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 21, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 20, 2022: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
  • October 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Competency Hearing - SDM]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 20, 2022: [Medical Evaluation Report - MT]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Psychiatric Exam ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 21, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
  • April 21, 2022: [Transfer of Jurisdiction (Preliminary) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.