U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00037
  • Case Name: Jose Valdez v. Deb Haaland
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference - Interim]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Appear]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Entry of Appearance - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [Appear]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • October 31, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • September 28, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • August 30, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • April 21, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Transfer - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.