U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cruz-Soriano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 25, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 25, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • August 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 16, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 03, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 03, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 27, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 21, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 21, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • April 21, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.