U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. King
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 27, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 27, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 27, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 27, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 27, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 27, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 27, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 24, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • June 08, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 28, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 21, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 21, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 21, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.