U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brumfield et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 19, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 15, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 13, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • September 13, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 13, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 07, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • August 29, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 24, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Hearing]
  • August 08, 2022: [Letter - MT]
  • August 08, 2022: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [Hearing ]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • July 15, 2022: [Letter - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • May 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 31, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • May 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 05, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 05, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 22, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.