U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Real Bird
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 11, 2024: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • October 02, 2024: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • September 26, 2024: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 26, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 26, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 26, 2024: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 20, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 20, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 20, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 30, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 30, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 14, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 13, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • June 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 10, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 28, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 28, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 28, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 27, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.