U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Amyotte
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 19, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • October 03, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 22, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 01, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • July 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 12, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [Arrest ]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.