U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00029
  • Case Name: Parkerson v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Serve - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 03, 2023: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • December 16, 2022: [Social Security Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • December 02, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to Serve - MT]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.