U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reed
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 14, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 14, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 14, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 14, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 05, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 05, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 05, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 10, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 09, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.