U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whitby
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 14, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 14, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 29, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 29, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 22, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 24, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • May 24, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 19, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 26, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 22, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.