U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Souza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • December 16, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 16, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Petition to Open Juvenile/Sealed Records and Order - MT]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 20, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • July 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 26, 2022: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • July 26, 2022: [Remark - MT]
  • July 25, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • July 25, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 25, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • July 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 22, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.