U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Murrieta et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 27, 2024: [Dismiss ]
  • September 27, 2024: [GLACIER Court Proceedings]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • December 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 28, 2022: [Vacate]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • December 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • December 07, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • November 14, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 31, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 20, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 19, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 30, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • July 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • July 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 25, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • July 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 22, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.