U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jefferson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 21, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 09, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 08, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 08, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • August 08, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 05, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • August 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 06, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order]
  • May 05, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing - SDM]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 29, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 22, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.