U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Graves
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 07, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Appoint Counsel ]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 19, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 19, 2023: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 19, 2023: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • January 06, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 25, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • August 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Modifying Conditions of Release - MT]
  • June 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 29, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 27, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 27, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 27, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 27, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • April 22, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.