U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fetter et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Satisfaction of Judgment - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 16, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • December 16, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 16, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 16, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • December 14, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 14, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • December 05, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • November 30, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 02, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 02, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 28, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 28, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 27, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 15, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • July 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 14, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • July 13, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 22, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.