U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00039
  • Case Name: Lentz v. Wal-Mart SuperCenter et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • July 25, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • July 01, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • May 17, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 26, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 25, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.