U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00082
  • Case Name: Grey v. Jacobsen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 16, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • November 14, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order]
  • November 11, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 11, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 11, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 02, 2022: [Pro Se Response to Order - MT]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 03, 2022: [Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 14, 2022: [Pro Se Notice - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 31, 2022: [Pro Se Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 31, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • August 26, 2022: [Pro Se Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 26, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 19, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 18, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • July 15, 2022: [Pro Se Notice - MT]
  • July 01, 2022: [Pro Se Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 01, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • July 01, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • June 21, 2022: [Vacate]
  • June 17, 2022: [Pro Se Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 17, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Correction (Text Only) - MT]
  • June 14, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 14, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 07, 2022: [Pro Se Motion for Extension - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 02, 2022: [Pro Se Notice - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 31, 2022: [Pro Se Registration Form]
  • May 26, 2022: [Consent to Electronic Service]
  • May 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 17, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 17, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 17, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 13, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • May 02, 2022: [Proof of Service - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 26, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 26, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 26, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.