U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00030
  • Case Name: Robertson v. S.T.A.R.T. Facility Program et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 18, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • May 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.