U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00042
  • Case Name: Chalupa v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • January 23, 2023: [Attorney Fees]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • November 18, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 25, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 26, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Social Security Briefing Schedule - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Administrative Record]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • May 06, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 29, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • April 28, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.