U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00084
  • Case Name: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Clarke
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 19, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • August 18, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Service - SDM]
  • May 06, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Service - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 29, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 29, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • April 29, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.