U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00046
  • Case Name: Hodges et al v. Benefis Medical Group, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Costs Taxed]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • May 12, 2022: [Application for Taxation of Costs - SDM]
  • May 06, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • May 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 06, 2022: [Remark]
  • May 06, 2022: [Jury List]
  • May 06, 2022: [Jury Verdict - Redacted -MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Jury Verdict - Unredacted - SDM]
  • May 06, 2022: [Jury Notes]
  • May 06, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 06, 2022: [Witness List - SDM]
  • May 06, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • May 03, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 03, 2022: [Jury List]
  • May 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [Jury Trial - Held - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order]
  • April 29, 2022: [Pretrial Order]
  • April 28, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • April 28, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 28, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Final - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.