U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-00029
  • Case Name: Foothill Insurance Company v. Accredited Surety & Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 06, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • August 01, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 05, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 16, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 31, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 03, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 03, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.