U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00085
  • Case Name: Karlsson v. Karlsson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 12, 2022: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 12, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 12, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 09, 2022: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • May 09, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 05, 2022: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Service - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 29, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.