U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00043
  • Case Name: United States of America et al v. Bridger Pipeline LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 03, 2023: [Stay]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Staying Case]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order]
  • July 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 19, 2022: [Vacate]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • July 14, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
  • July 12, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 08, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 08, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 14, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • June 14, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 14, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 31, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • May 05, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.