U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00087
  • Case Name: Correa v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • June 09, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 02, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.