U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harrelson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 28, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 27, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 04, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • May 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 05, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • May 05, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • May 05, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.