U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00088
  • Case Name: Shipp v. LM General Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 29, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 18, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 07, 2022: [Settlement Conference - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 24, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 24, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 07, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • May 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 09, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • May 09, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.