U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00033
  • Case Name: First National Bancorp, Inc. et al v. StarNet Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Settlement]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 09, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 09, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 09, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.